PA HB653 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in real property, providing for real estate foreclosure of vacant and abandoned property and for sheriff's commission and creditor attorney fees.
Title
In real property, providing for real estate foreclosure of vacant and abandoned property and for sheriff's commission and creditor attorney fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 3613, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 3613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 692, A5634, LEACH AMENDMENT NO. A-5634 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 692, A5635, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-5635 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 692, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 692, 2017 A1054, SUSP RULES, DELUCA (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 3613, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 3613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 692, A5634, LEACH AMENDMENT NO. A-5634 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 653 PN 692, A5635, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-5635 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 692, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 653 PN 692, 2017 A1054, SUSP RULES, DELUCA (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Act No. 32 |
2018-06-19 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-12 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-11 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2018-06-11 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-06 | House | In the House |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2017-05-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-08 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |