PA HB628 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys.
Title
In Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Harry Readshaw [D] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A00146 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |