PA HB623 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in authorized disposition of offenders, prohibiting Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition for child sexual offenses.
Title
In authorized disposition of offenders, prohibiting Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition for child sexual offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 623 PN 723, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Floor: HB 623 PN 723, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-10-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2015-10-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |