PA HB62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for alternative procedure for relinquishment.
Title
In proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for alternative procedure for relinquishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 62 PN 57, FP (Y: 184 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 62 PN 57, FP (Y: 184 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-03-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-3) |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-08 | House | Second consideration |
2017-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |