PA HB60 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-27 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-27 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Township of Harrison, Allegheny County, being conveyed by the township in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands being conveyed to the township.
Title
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Township of Harrison, Allegheny County, being conveyed by the township in return for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands being conveyed to the township.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-04-27 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-04-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-18 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-17 | Second consideration | |
2007-03-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-20 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-20 | First consideration | |
2007-03-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=60 |