PA HB583 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 30, 1983 (P.L.160, No.39), known as the Public Official Compensation Law, further providing for judicial salaries, for compensation of Governor and Lieutenant Governor, State Treasurer, Auditor General, Attorney General, Commissioners of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission and heads of departments, for members of the General Assembly and for cost-of-living adjustment hiatus.
Title
Further providing for judicial salaries, for compensation of Governor and Lieutenant Governor, State Treasurer, Auditor General, Attorney General, Commissioners of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission and heads of departments, for members of the General Assembly and for cost-of-living adjustment hiatus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-17 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |