PA HB575 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-19)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-05 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-05 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for a special license plate for recipients of the Silver Star, Bronze Star and Bronze Star for Valor.
Title
Providing for a special license plate for recipients of the Silver Star, Bronze Star and Bronze Star for Valor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-05 | Removed from table | |
2010-10-05 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-29 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-29 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-08 | Removed from table | |
2010-02-09 | Laid on the table | |
2010-02-09 | First consideration | |
2010-02-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |