PA HB561 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-18)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-18)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions.
Title
In consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 561 PN 634, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 561 PN 634, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 561 PN 634, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Act No. 6 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2015-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to FINANCE |