PA HB480 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in corporate powers, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In corporate powers, further providing for intergovernmental cooperation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 480 PN 504, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as committed
2018-04-11SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2018-01-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-28HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-02-14HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=480
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0480&pn=0504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=409
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/11/2017&RollCallId=882
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1064
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=796

Bill Comments

feedback