PA HB48 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 64-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for transfers not subject to tax.
Title
Further providing for transfers not subject to tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - House - HB 48 PN 530, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A46, MUNDY (Y: 90 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A41, WHITE (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A28, DEAN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A46, MUNDY (Y: 90 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A41, WHITE (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 48 PN 36, 2013 A28, DEAN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to FINANCE |