PA HB48 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for definitions, for wine marketing, for sacramental wine licenses, fees, privileges and restrictions, for interlocking businesses prohibited, for number and kinds of licenses allowed same licensee, for limited number of retail licenses to be issued in each county, for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees, for licenses issued and for limited wineries.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for wine marketing, for sacramental wine licenses, fees, privileges and restrictions, for interlocking businesses prohibited, for number and kinds of licenses allowed same licensee, for limited number of retail licenses to be issued in each county, for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees, for licenses issued and for limited wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - House - HB 48 PN 3850, CONCUR (Y: 136 N: 55 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - Senate - HB 48 PN 3850, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - HB 48 PN 3578, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - HB 48 PN 3578, CONCUR (Y: 156 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-02 - Senate - HB 48 PN 2368, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Senate - HB 48 PN 2092, A2310, LOGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-2310 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - HB 48 PN 1574, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 155 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - House - HB 48 PN 1395, 2009 A649, PETRI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-08 - Senate - HB 48 PN 3850, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - HB 48 PN 3578, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - HB 48 PN 3578, CONCUR (Y: 156 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-02 - Senate - HB 48 PN 2368, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Senate - HB 48 PN 2092, A2310, LOGAN AMENDMENT NO. A-2310 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - HB 48 PN 1574, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 155 N: 37 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - House - HB 48 PN 1395, 2009 A649, PETRI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Act No. 35 | |
2010-06-25 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-06-16 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-06-15 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-06-14 | Signed in House | |
2010-06-14 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-06-14 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-06-08 | In the House | |
2010-06-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate | |
2010-06-07 | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended | |
2010-05-25 | Re-committed to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-05-25 | Vote by which Senate concurred in House amendments reconsidered | |
2010-05-05 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-05-04 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-05-03 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-04-21 | In the Senate | |
2010-04-21 | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House | |
2010-04-20 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2009-07-02 | In the House | |
2009-07-02 | Final passage | |
2009-07-02 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2009-07-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-01 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-01 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-06-29 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-10 | First consideration | |
2009-06-10 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2009-04-22 | In the Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-21 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-04-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-20 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-20 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-01 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-01 | First consideration | |
2009-04-01 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |