PA HB466 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in officers serving process and enforcing orders, further providing for powers and duties of the sheriff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In officers serving process and enforcing orders, further providing for powers and duties of the sheriff.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06262 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-17HouseReported as amended
2017-02-23HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback