PA HB452 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for licensed places may be closed during period of emergency and providing for safekeeping during 2020 disaster emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for licensed places may be closed during period of emergency and providing for safekeeping during 2020 disaster emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00416 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00386 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as amended
2021-02-09HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=452
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0452&pn=0413
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0452&pn=0940
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=137
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=140
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=139

Bill Comments

feedback