PA HB442 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 86-29)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 86-29)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, prohibiting private transfer fee obligations; and providing for notice and disclosure of existing private transfer fee obligations.
Title
Prohibiting private transfer fee obligations; and providing for notice and disclosure of existing private transfer fee obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - House - HB 442 PN 2083, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - HB 442 PN 2083, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 442 PN 1040, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 442 PN 714, 2011 A872, HARPER (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - HB 442 PN 2083, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 442 PN 1040, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 442 PN 714, 2011 A872, HARPER (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | House | Act No. 8 |
2011-06-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-15 | House | Signed in House |
2011-06-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-1) |
2011-06-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-06-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-06-14 | House | In the House |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2011-03-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-03-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2011-03-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-03-02 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-16 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-04 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |