PA HB40 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 101-40)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 101-40)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing, in general principles of justification, for definitions, for use of force in self-protection, for use of force for the protection of other persons, for grading of theft offenses and for licenses to carry firearms; and providing for civil immunity for use of force.
Title
Further providing, in general principles of justification, for definitions, for use of force in self-protection, for use of force for the protection of other persons, for grading of theft offenses and for licenses to carry firearms; and providing for civil immunity for use of force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - HB 40 PN 1038, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, FP (Y: 164 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, MOT RECOM, BRIGGS (Y: 39 N: 151 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, 2011 A918, BOYLE, B. (Y: 54 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, 2011 A916, BRIGGS (Y: 50 N: 140 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, FP (Y: 164 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, MOT RECOM, BRIGGS (Y: 39 N: 151 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, 2011 A918, BOYLE, B. (Y: 54 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - HB 40 PN 1038, 2011 A916, BRIGGS (Y: 50 N: 140 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 10 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-5) |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (164-37) |
2011-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-03-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-09 | House | Second consideration |
2011-03-08 | House | Removed from table |
2011-03-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-03-07 | House | First consideration |
2011-03-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |