PA HB359 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in enforcement, further providing for powers and duties of enforcement officers and for suspension of privileges pending payment of penalties; in hunting and furtaking, further providing for killing game or wildlife by mistake; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for period of revocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In enforcement, further providing for powers and duties of enforcement officers and for suspension of privileges pending payment of penalties; in hunting and furtaking, further providing for killing game or wildlife by mistake; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for period of revocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 359 PN 2922, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 359 PN 2922, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 359 PN 377, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseAct No. 3
2018-02-15HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-02-06HousePresented to the Governor
2018-02-06HouseSigned in Senate
2018-02-05HouseSigned in House
2018-02-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
2018-02-05HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-02-05HouseReferred to RULES
2018-01-30HouseIn the House
2018-01-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2018-01-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-01-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-13SenateReported as amended
2017-06-22SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2017-06-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as committed
2017-02-07HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=359
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0359&pn=0377
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0359&pn=2822
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0359&pn=2922
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=529
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=699
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=12/13/2017&RollCallId=598
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/29/2018&RollCallId=639
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=1244
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=990

Bill Comments

feedback