PA HB352 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time, providing for ten year limitation, for mesne profits and for reimbursement and further providing for twenty-one year limitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In limitation of time, providing for ten year limitation, for mesne profits and for reimbursement and further providing for twenty-one year limitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 352 PN 364, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 352 PN 364, FP (Y: 167 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Judiciary: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateAct No. 34
2018-06-19SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-12SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-11SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-11SenateSigned in House
2018-06-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-05SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-04SenateRemoved from table
2017-11-15SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-10-03SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-03SenateReported as committed
2017-05-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-05-09SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (167-28)
2017-05-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-21HouseRe-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
2017-03-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS
2017-02-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=352
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0352&pn=0364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=383
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=528

Bill Comments

feedback