PA HB324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 72 (Taxation and Fiscal Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing microenterprise loan programs and abating real property assessment.
Title
Establishing microenterprise loan programs and abating real property assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 324 PN 302, FP (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 324 PN 302, FP (Y: 192 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2019-03-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-2) |
2019-03-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |