PA HB2966 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2020, further providing for additional appropriations and replacement of appropriations from the General Fund and other funds and accounts for the expenses of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020.
Title
A Supplement to the act of May 29, 2020 (P.L. , No.1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2020, further providing for additional appropriations and replacement of appropriations from the General Fund and other funds and accounts for the expenses of the Executive Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-11-18 | House | Second consideration |
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-11-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-11-16 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |