PA HB282 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 77-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for regulation of contracts; providing for annual adjustment; further providing for evasion of advertising requirements, for contracts between $750 and $10,000 and for separate bids for plumbing, heating, ventilating and electrical work.
Title
Amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for regulation of contracts; providing for annual adjustment; further providing for evasion of advertising requirements, for contracts between $750 and $10,000 and for separate bids for plumbing, heating, ventilating and electrical work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 282 PN 1430, FP (Y: 119 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 282 PN 1430, FP (Y: 119 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (119-79) |
2011-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-05 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |