PA HB267 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of Department of Labor and Industry, further providing for fair share fee and payroll deduction.
Title
In powers and duties of Department of Labor and Industry, further providing for fair share fee and payroll deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07242 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07242 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |