PA HB2619 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for State-related university performance-based funding incentive.
Title
Providing for State-related university performance-based funding incentive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2619 PN 3270, FP (Y: 111 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04803 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04803 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (111-89) |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-05-24 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |