PA HB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 41, FP (Y: 168 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Floor: HB 26 PN 41, FP (Y: 168 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-02-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (168-6) |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-02-06 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |