PA HB26 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act No. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, further providing for contributions by employees; establishing the Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund; and further providing for the Unemployment Compensation Fund.
Title
Further providing for contributions by employees; establishing the Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund; and further providing for the Unemployment Compensation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - HB 26 PN 1944, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 26 PN 1944, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - HB 26 PN 1795, 2013 A1672, KELLER, W. (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - HB 26 PN 1944, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - HB 26 PN 1795, 2013 A1672, KELLER, W. (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 34 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-05-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |