PA HB2593 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 23, 1970 (P.L.563, No.195), known as the Public Employe Relations Act, in definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in employee rights, providing for notice of right to resign membership.
Title
In definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in employee rights, providing for notice of right to resign membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-08-10 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |