PA HB2555 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-5)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-16 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on May 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-16 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Title 5 (Athletics and Sports) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for duties of State Athletic Commission; in regulation of boxing contests and exhibitions, further providing for age of participants and for gloves; in wrestling, further providing for definitions and for physician to be in attendance; and, in registration of athlete agents, further providing for bonding requirements.
Title
An Act amending Title 5 (Athletics and Sports) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for duties of State Athletic Commission; in regulation of boxing contests and exhibitions, further providing for age of participants and for gloves; in wrestling, further providing for definitions and for physician to be in attendance; and, in registration of athlete agents, further providing for bonding requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-16 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-16 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | First consideration | |
2008-09-15 | Reported as committed | |
2008-06-11 | Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2008-06-11 | Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2008-05-20 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2555 |