PA HB250 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.
Title
In fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Floor: HB 250 PN 213, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Floor: HB 250 PN 213, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2023-09-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-09-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2023-09-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-09-26 | House | Second consideration |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-29 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-29 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |