PA HB25 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, enacting uniform laws on attestation in the areas of unsworn foreign declarations and notarial acts; making editorial changes; making related repeals; and abrogating a regulation.
Title
Enacting uniform laws on attestation in the areas of unsworn foreign declarations and notarial acts; making editorial changes; making related repeals; and abrogating a regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-24 - Senate - HB 25 PN 1551, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 25 PN 1551, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 25 PN 1551, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-09 | Senate | Act No. 73 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-05-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-23 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |