PA HB2497 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on May 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and for additional services for eligible persons other than the medically needy; providing for payments for readmissions to a hospital paid through diagnosis-related groups and for maximum payment to practitioners for inpatient hospitalization; further providing for time periods; providing for hospital assessments; further providing for third-party liability and for data matching; and providing for Federal law recovery of medical assistance reimbursement.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and for additional services for eligible persons other than the medically needy; providing for payments for readmissions to a hospital paid through diagnosis-related groups and for maximum payment to practitioners for inpatient hospitalization; further providing for time periods; providing for hospital assessments; further providing for third-party liability and for data matching; and providing for Federal law recovery of medical assistance reimbursement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-14 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-14 | First consideration | |
2008-05-14 | Reported as amended | |
2008-05-08 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2497 |