PA HB246 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-13 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 19, 1931 (P.L.589, No.202), referred to as the Barbers' License Law, further providing for licensure of manager-barbers and barber-teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for licensure of manager-barbers and barber-teachers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 246 PN 2412, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03292 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03292 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-13SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2015-11-09SenateIn the Senate
2015-11-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2015-11-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-10-28HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-10-28HouseSecond consideration
2015-10-27HouseRemoved from table
2015-10-21HouseLaid on the table
2015-10-21HouseFirst consideration
2015-10-21HouseReported as amended
2015-01-28HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=246
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0246&pn=0246
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0246&pn=2412
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/20/2015&rNbr=1024
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/20/2015&rNbr=1023
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=846
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/09/2015&rNbr=1092
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/20/2015&RollCallId=1023
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/20/2015&RollCallId=1024
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/09/2015&RollCallId=1092

Bill Comments 750

feedback