PA HB2441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Supplement to the act of April 1, 1863 (P.L.213, No.227), entitled "An act to accept the grant of Public Lands, by the United States, to the several states, for the endowment of Agricultural Colleges," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure; and making an appropriation from a restricted account within the Agricultural College Land Scrip Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Supplement to the act of April 1, 1863 (P.L.213, No.227), entitled "An act to accept the grant of Public Lands, by the United States, to the several states, for the endowment of Agricultural Colleges," making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure; and making an appropriation from a restricted account within the Agricultural College Land Scrip Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2441 PN 3623, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2441 PN 3623, FP (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29SenateAct No. 3A
2020-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-05-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-05-28SenateSigned in Senate
2020-05-28SenateSigned in House
2020-05-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-05-27SenateSecond consideration
2020-05-26SenateFirst consideration
2020-05-26SenateReported as committed
2020-05-26SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-26SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-4)
2020-05-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-05-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-04HouseSecond consideration
2020-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-29HouseReported as committed
2020-04-27HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2441
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2441&pn=3623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=1910
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=877
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2129

Bill Comments

feedback