PA HB2428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in open meetings, further providing for definitions, for minutes of meetings, public records and recording of meetings, for public notice, for public participation and for use of equipment during meetings.
Title
In open meetings, further providing for definitions, for minutes of meetings, public records and recording of meetings, for public notice, for public participation and for use of equipment during meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2428 PN 3054, 2021 A4228 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04143 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04145 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2428 PN 3054, 2021 A4228 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04143 (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04145 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2022-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-06 | House | Removed from table |
2022-07-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |