PA HB2376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, providing for retail store closure during declaration of disaster emergency and for contactless and curbside business operations during declaration of disaster emergency.
Title
In Commonwealth services, providing for retail store closure during declaration of disaster emergency and for contactless and curbside business operations during declaration of disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3566, FP (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3566, BOYLE, MOT RECMT HEALTH (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3514, 2019 A4942, EVERETT (Y: 121 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3566, FP (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3566, BOYLE, MOT RECMT HEALTH (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2376 PN 3514, 2019 A4942, EVERETT (Y: 121 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (112-90) |
2020-04-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |