PA HB2372 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in abandoned vehicles and cargos, further providing for reports by private property owners of abandoned vehicles and providing for abandoned vehicles at wholesale vehicle auctions.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in abandoned vehicles and cargos, further providing for reports by private property owners of abandoned vehicles and providing for abandoned vehicles at wholesale vehicle auctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2372 PN 2783, FP (Y: 109 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2372 PN 2783, FP (Y: 109 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-90) |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |