PA HB2308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in post-trial matters, further providing for postconviction DNA testing; and, in DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases, providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions and further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, for DNA data base exchange and for expungement..
Title
In post-trial matters, further providing for postconviction DNA testing; and, in DNA data and testing, further providing for policy, for definitions, for powers and duties of State Police, for State DNA Data Base, for State DNA Data Bank, for State Police recommendation of additional offenses, for procedural compatibility with FBI and for DNA sample required upon conviction, delinquency adjudication and certain ARD cases, providing for collection from persons accepted from other jurisdictions and further providing for procedures for withdrawal, collection and transmission of DNA samples, for procedures for conduct, disposition and use of DNA analysis, for DNA data base exchange and for expungement..
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2308 PN 4068, FP (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09041 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2308 PN 4068, FP (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09041 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-10-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-3) |
2018-10-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-09 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |