PA HB2269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in source selection and contract formation, further providing for debarment or suspension.
Title
In source selection and contract formation, further providing for debarment or suspension.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Joe Hamm [R] |
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Sheryl Delozier [R] |
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-09 | House | Second consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |