PA HB2242 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions and for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Act No. 104 |
2014-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (203-0) |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-29 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-29 | House | In the House |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Final passage (197-0) |
2014-06-16 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-02 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-02 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-referred to HEALTH |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to HEALTH |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |