PA HB2213 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on February 1 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-13 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for real property, for personal property and for letting contracts.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for real property, for personal property and for letting contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-02-12 | Laid on the table | |
2008-02-12 | First consideration | |
2008-02-12 | Reported as committed | |
2008-02-01 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2213 |