PA HB2194 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-06 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-06 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for burial details for veterans.
Title
Further providing for burial details for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-06 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-05 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-04 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-04 | First consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-01-06 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |