PA HB2189 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and defining the offense of sexting by minors.
Title
Further providing for the offense of sexual abuse of children; and defining the offense of sexting by minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - House - HB 2189 PN 4008, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 163 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - House - HB 2189 PN 3372, 2009 A8179, VITALI (Y: 60 N: 138 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-28 - House - HB 2189 PN 3372, 2009 A8179, VITALI (Y: 60 N: 138 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-29 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-28 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-28 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-28 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-17 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-16 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-16 | First consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Reported as amended | |
2010-01-05 | Referred to JUDICIARY |