PA HB2166 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 16 (Counties) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in coroner, further providing for fees for reports.
Title
In coroner, further providing for fees for reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2166 PN 3163, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04468 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2166 PN 3163, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A04468 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-99) |
2024-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-11 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |