PA HB2133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Kinship Caregiver Navigator Program in the Department of Human Services; and providing for kinship caregiver navigator website and for kinship caregiver navigators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Kinship Caregiver Navigator Program in the Department of Human Services; and providing for kinship caregiver navigator website and for kinship caregiver navigators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2133 PN 3817, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2133 PN 3817, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2133 PN 3107, FP (Y: 190 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Children And Youth: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-23HouseAct No. 89
2018-10-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (180-1)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-22SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-20SenateReported as committed
2018-04-30SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2018-04-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-2)
2018-04-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-10HouseReported as committed
2018-03-09HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2133
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2133&pn=3107
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2133&pn=3817
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1401
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/17/2018&RollCallId=1455
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=999
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1038
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2112

Bill Comments

feedback