PA HB2131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 1, 1945 (P.L.1242, No.428), known as the State Highway Law, in construction, improvement, maintenance and repair of State highways, providing for native vegetation along highways.
Title
In construction, improvement, maintenance and repair of State highways, providing for native vegetation along highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Quigley [R] | Rep. Alexander Charlton [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Steven Mentzer [R] |
Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2131 PN 3592, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07226 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 2131 PN 3592, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07226 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-05 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |