PA HB2128 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for drug overdose medication and providing for requirements.
Title
Further providing for drug overdose medication and providing for requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-08-18 | House | Removed from table |
2016-08-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-06-09 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |