PA HB211 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-22)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-07-02 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on February 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-07-02 - Removed from table
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions relating to taxation.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for exemptions and special provisions relating to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-02 | Removed from table | |
2008-07-02 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-11-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-01 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-24 | First consideration | |
2007-10-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-05 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=211 |