PA HB2101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, further providing for definitions, for procedure for licensing as professional engineer, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for procedure for licensing as professional engineer, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Harry Readshaw [D] | Rep. James Marshall [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2101 PN 3257, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A04619 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2101 PN 3257, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A04619 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-28 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |