PA HB203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for living donor protection; and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Insurance Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for living donor protection; and imposing duties on the Department of Health and the Insurance Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 203 PN 239, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 203 PN 239, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A00162 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateAct No. 11
2021-04-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-04-21SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned in Senate
2021-04-21SenateSigned in House
2021-04-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-04-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-23SenateReported as committed
2021-02-11SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-27HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-26HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-26HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-26HouseReported as amended
2021-01-21HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=203
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0203&pn=0168
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0203&pn=0239
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0203&pn=0168&aYear=2021&an=00162
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0203P0239.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0203P0239.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=01/26/2021&RollCallId=26
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=01/26/2021&RollCallId=27
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=29
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=100
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=72
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=111
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=71

Bill Comments

feedback