PA HB1985 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 15, 1971 (P.L.596, No.160), known as the Outdoor Advertising Control Act of 1971, further providing for definitions, for control of outdoor advertising, for removal of prohibited advertising devices and for penalties for violation; and imposing a duty on the Secretary of Transportation to notify the Federal Highway Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for control of outdoor advertising, for removal of prohibited advertising devices and for penalties for violation; and imposing a duty on the Secretary of Transportation to notify the Federal Highway Administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1985 PN 2888, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-22SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2019-11-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as amended
2019-10-25HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1985
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1985&pn=2790
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1985&pn=2888
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=1447

Bill Comments

feedback