PA HB1985 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1971 (P.L.596, No.160), known as the Outdoor Advertising Control Act of 1971, further providing for definitions, for control of outdoor advertising, for removal of prohibited advertising devices and for penalties for violation; and imposing a duty on the Secretary of Transportation to notify the Federal Highway Administration.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for control of outdoor advertising, for removal of prohibited advertising devices and for penalties for violation; and imposing a duty on the Secretary of Transportation to notify the Federal Highway Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1985 PN 2888, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1985 PN 2888, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03730 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-11-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |