PA HB1951 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, providing for the offense of access of minors to dextromethorphan and imposing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In minors, providing for the offense of access of minors to dextromethorphan and imposing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1951 PN 2762, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1951 PN 2762, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24SenateAct No. 116
2018-10-24SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-10-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17SenateSigned in Senate
2018-10-17SenateSigned in House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-10-15SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-15SenateReported as committed
2018-01-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-01-23SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as committed
2017-11-30HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1951
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1951&pn=2762
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1092
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1193
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/16/2018&RollCallId=1223
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=740

Bill Comments

feedback